Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Guzzone, Kagan, and Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring each State building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the State to meet the standards to the extent practicable and within budgetary constraints; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing State buildings in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0192
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0314 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/12/2020 2:37 PM