Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Trauma-Informed Care to coordinate a statewide initiative to prioritize the trauma-responsive and trauma-informed delivery of State services that impact children, youth, families, and older adults; requiring the Commission to submit its findings annually to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30; requiring certain State agencies to designate two staff members to participate in a formal course in trauma-informed care each year and work with other agency designees in work sessions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0548
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0918 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
(   8-1301 through 8-1310 )
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 10:55 AM
Click to return on the top page