Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Guzzone, Hayes, Klausmeier, Lee, McCray, Patterson, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 9
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain employees to sue to recover the difference between certain prevailing wage rates and certain amounts under certain circumstances; providing that a certain determination by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry does not preclude certain employees from filing a certain action; and providing for the liability of certain contractors and subcontractors under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0524
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0572 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 9
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable Adopted 32
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed 32
Text - Third - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 34
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Economic Matters 36
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-42) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Returned Passed 42
Post Passage 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 9
Text - Chapter - Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM