Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant to have graduated from at least a master's level program in acupuncture, or its equivalent, approved by certain entities to qualify for a license to practice acupuncture; altering the authority of the State Acupuncture Board to find certain programs to be equivalent to certain courses for licensure requirements; providing that certain provisions of the Act may be construed to apply only prospectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614032/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Committee Amendment {614032/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614032/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {533229/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-15)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614032/1 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Committee Amendment {614032/1 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 41
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614032/1 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614032/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {533229/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 46A
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (120-15) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1A-101, 1A-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM