Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Ellis, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "recyclable materials" under the Maryland Recycling Act to exclude incinerator ash; and repealing the authority of a county to utilize a resource recovery facility to meet 5% of the waste reduction required to be achieved through recycling in the county's recycling plan.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0280
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {494236/1 Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:35 PM
Click to return on the top page