Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Kagan, Lam, Patterson, Rosapepe, Washington, Bailey, Carozza, Ellis, Gallion, and Hester
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship to repeal a provision of law requiring a certain applicant to apply within 2 years after graduating from high school; establishing certain eligibility requirements to allow a certain applicant to have earned a cumulative grade point average of at least 2.3 on a 4.0 scale or its equivalent in the senior year of high school for an initial award or at least 2.5 on a 4.0 scale while enrolled at a community college; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504466/1
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504466/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {884436/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Appropriations 28
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {504466/1 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {504466/1 Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/30/2020 3:41 PM