Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Lee, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse" in provisions of law relating to child abuse to include the sex trafficking of a child by any individual; defining the terms "sexual molestation or exploitation" and "sex trafficking" in provisions of law relating to child abuse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {673920/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {512614/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Floor Amendment {673920/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Judiciary 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {512614/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text - Chapter - Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM