Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an applicant who graduated from high school 5 or more years before the date of application is not subject to a certain grade point requirement to be eligible for the Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {544735/1 Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Appropriations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/8/2021 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page