Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Guzzone, Young, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Pinsky, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making specified requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a certain request to be made in a certain manner; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet specified requirements; establishing specified requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a specified form; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468672/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468672/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {468672/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Rejected (23-23)
Proceedings
55
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468672/1 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-29) 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468672/1 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {468672/1 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments Rejected (23-23) 55
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103 )
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-16 )
(   27-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM