Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Guzzone
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize the risk of bird collisions; requiring each building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the Department to meet certain standards related to the types of glass used and the transparency of passageways and corners to the extent practicable; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing public buildings using automatic control technologies to the extent practicable; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0136
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1009 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604031/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604031/1
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-18)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (25-21)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496682/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604031/1 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 34
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604031/1 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-18) 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Third Reading Passed (25-21) 38
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 40
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {496682/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM