Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Sponsored by
Senators Hough and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the method for filling a vacancy on the Frederick County Board of Education; specifying that an individual appointed to fill a vacancy serves for the remainder of a certain term and until a successor is appointed and qualifies except that under certain circumstances the individual serves only until a successor is elected at the next general election; specifying how certain positions are to be filled at a general election; establishing the manner for nominating candidates for vacated offices; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0410
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Ways and Means 42A
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 11:28 AM