Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Standard Deduction – Alteration and Cost–of–Living Adjustments
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Serafini, Currie, Bates, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Edwards, Guzzone, Hershey, King, Hough, McFadden, Jennings, Peters, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the determination of the amount of the standard deduction allowed for an individual under the Maryland income tax; altering the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain taxable years by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499136/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499136/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {155465/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 43
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31) 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Ways and Means 45
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {155465/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84) 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax – Standard Deduction – Alteration and Cost–of–Living Adjustments
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Standard Deduction – Alteration and Cost–of–Living Adjustments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-217 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM