Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a foreign corporation to certify that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is the corporation's resident agent when registering or qualifying with the Department; and authorizing the Department to act as a resident agent for a foreign corporation that does business in the State without a resident agent or with a resident agent who cannot be found or served with the exercise of reasonable diligence.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0891 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 2:20 PM