Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program to provide grants for the expansion of, the renovation of, or major repairs to a facility operated by a certain eligible organization; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2023 through 2028, to include $3,000,000 for the Program in the State budget; requiring the establishment of a competitive application process and a quantitative system to evaluate each application; prohibiting an organization from receiving a grant for a single project that exceeds $1,000,000 in any fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0310
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0287 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 4:41 PM