Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a cigar shop beer, wine, and liquor license in Frederick County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a specified establishment; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor to a cigar shop customer for consumption in the smoking room of the cigar shop; prohibiting the average daily receipts from the sale of alcoholic beverages at the cigar shop from exceeding a specified amount; providing for an annual fee of $500; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0396
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1002.1, 20-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM