Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Hough, McFadden, Muse, Ramirez, Raskin, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of specified misdemeanor convictions; requiring a person to file a petition for expungement in a specified court; providing that a petition for expungement of specified misdemeanor convictions may not be filed earlier than 10 years after the person satisfied the specified sentence or sentences imposed for all convictions for which expungement is requested; requiring the court to provided written notice of the petition to all victims listed in the case; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0220
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1292 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638474/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {638474/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM