Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Outbreak Response Plan (Olivia’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public institution of higher education to submit an outbreak response plan to the Maryland Department of Health on or before August 1 each year, beginning in 2021; requiring a public institution of higher education to implement the outbreak response plan under certain circumstances; requiring the outbreak response plan to include certain processes and the provision of certain staff; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0187
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Outbreak Response Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184531/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Outbreak Response Plan
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments {184531/1 Adopted 36
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Public Institutions of Higher Education – Outbreak Response Plan (Olivia’s Law)
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 38
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Appropriations 39
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-214.2 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:36 AM