Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Guzzone, King, Lee, Patterson, Waldstreicher, West, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; providing that the Department of General Services, the University System of Maryland, and the Department of Transportation are responsible for the enforcement of certain provisions of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1244
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488672/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {666282/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Waldstreicher, Hester and Washington)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Waldstreicher, Hester and Washington)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Hill, Charles and Chisholm)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Hill, Charles and Chisholm)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {893721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {893721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-17)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {488672/1 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {488672/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 50
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {666282/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Waldstreicher, Hester and Washington) 62A
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Waldstreicher, Hester and Washington) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Hill, Charles and Chisholm) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Hill, Charles and Chisholm) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {893721/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {893721/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (117-17) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text - Chapter - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-801 through 2-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM