Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State, for certain construction projects and major renovation projects proposed after December 31, 2021, to require that the project be designed, engineered, and constructed in a manner that allows the roof to withstand the weight of solar panels; requiring certain construction projects and major renovation projects to include the installation of the maximum number of solar panels for which the project was designed; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to provide certain recommendations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0469
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0592 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2020
Legislative Date
9/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2020 9/17/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page