Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain clerk to account for and pay into the General Fund of the State the entire fee received for a trader's license issued in a county or municipal corporation that selects a uniform license fee; exempting from the fee a visually handicapped applicant who meets certain standards and Blind Industries and Services of Maryland; requiring a clerk to review the accuracy of a statement made by an applicant on the application for a trader's license regarding the applicant's place of business before issuing a license; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0034
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {557774/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Economic Matters 34
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1804, 17-1806 through 17-1808, 17-1807.1, 17-1813, 17-206, 17-302 )
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM