Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Appointment to Fill a Vacancy of an Elected Member - Candidate Information Requests
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain appointing authority, on request, to provide a list of the names of the candidates to fill a vacancy of an elected member of a county board of education to the individual who made the request or by publication on the website of the appointing authority; and defining "appointing authority" as the individual or entity that is responsible for appointing a qualified individual to fill a vacancy of an elected member of a county board.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Appointment to Fill a Vacancy of an Elected Member - Candidate Information Requests
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {454132/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Appointment to Fill a Vacancy of an Elected Member - Candidate Information Requests
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Text - Chapter - County Boards of Education - Appointment to Fill a Vacancy of an Elected Member - Candidate Information Requests
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-135 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM