Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who meets certain threshold standing requirements under federal law has an unconditional right and authority to intervene in a civil action that the State commenced in State court to require compliance with certain water pollution control measures; and requiring that a person who meets the requirements to intervene in a certain action has all the rights of a party in interest or an aggrieved party.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0076
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority
(   9-344.1 )
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:52 PM
Click to return on the top page