Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Hershey, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing the Public Service Commission, after notice to customers and holding a public hearing and an evidentiary hearing, to authorize a certain rate consolidation of two or more water or sewage disposal systems if the systems have common ownership and the rate consolidation is in the public interest.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0528
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {897478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {897478/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Referred Economic Matters 27
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM