Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Reilly (By Request - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland) and Senators Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Gallion, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Emergency Number Systems Board to establish certain minimum standards for records retention guidelines for 9-1-1 audio, video, text messages, and data; requiring the Board to establish minimum standards for certain 9-1-1 systems that ensure access for individuals with disabilities; altering the purposes of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund beginning on January 1, 2020; authorizing the use of money collected from a certain 9-1-1 fee to pay costs associated with maintenance, operations, and programs approved by the Board; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717674/1
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {717674/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {843125/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {836288/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {717674/1 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {717674/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Floor Amendment {843125/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 40
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Floor Committee Amendment {836288/1 Adopted 53
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-303, 1-304, 1-306, 1-307, 1-308, 1-309, 1-309.1, 1-310, 1-311, 1-312, 1-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM