Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Offenses Related to Voting - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which an individual is not qualified to be a registered voter to include if the individual has been convicted of a certain violation of the election law and less than 4 years have elapsed since the date of the conviction; and providing that a person who is convicted of a certain violation of the election law is ineligible to vote for a period of 4 years after the date of the conviction.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0694
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Offenses Related to Voting - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Offenses Related to Voting - Penalties
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page