Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Hester, Hough, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Miller, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Zucker, Bailey, Gallion, Kagan, Lam, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility for a certain veteran to reside at a home for veterans that is supervised by the Department of Veterans Affairs to include a veteran who has an honorable discharge from active service with a uniformed service of the United States.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {944735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {944735/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 11:50 AM