Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain required envelopes used by certain voters voting by absentee ballot to return their ballots include prepaid postage; requiring the State Board of Elections to reimburse each local board of elections for 50% of the costs of prepaid postage included on ballot/return envelopes or return envelopes provided to a voter voting by absentee ballot; and requiring that absentee ballots be accompanied by instructions for the postage of certain absentee ballot envelopes.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0269
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0711 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794337/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794337/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-16)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {963122/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {523221/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-30)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-18)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {794337/1 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {794337/1 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-16) 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Floor Amendment {963122/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Floor Amendment {523221/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-30) 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (28-18) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Ways and Means 43A
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM