Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person to obtain a license from the Department of Natural Resources before catching shrimp for commercial purposes; and authorizing the Department to adopt certain regulations governing any aspect of the shrimp fishery, including regulations establishing and implementing a pilot program related to fishing for shrimp.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:25 PM