Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 87.5% to 100% the percentage of eligible costs for which State cost-sharing funds may be made available for projects that prevent or control agriculturally related nonpoint source water pollution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2020
Legislative Date
9/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684036/1 Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2020 9/26/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {684036/1 Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - State Cost-Sharing Funds
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:35 PM
Click to return on the top page