Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Innovations in Aging Services Program - Commission on Aging - Responsibilities
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Innovations in Aging Services Advisory Council and transferring specified responsibilities of the Council to the Commission on Aging; providing that the Commission advise the Secretary of Aging on the development of an annual Innovation in Aging Services Program plan; and providing that the Commission shall advise the Secretary on the awarding of grants in accordance with the Program priorities.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 25
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Second Reading Passed 25
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 30
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-603, 10-604, 10-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM