Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, Rosapepe, Smith, Washington, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from loaning a regulated firearm to a certain borrower under certain circumstances; prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from selling, renting, loaning, or transferring a regulated firearm to a certain person who the dealer or other person knows or has reason to believe intends to commit a certain crime or cause certain harm; creating a certain exception; and providing that a person who is the borrower of a regulated firearm is not required to take a certified firearms safety training course.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0860 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {888374/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Sell, Rent, Transfer, or Loan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {652811/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-47)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Carter and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Carter and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Sydnor)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Sydnor)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {893920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {893920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-37)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transfer
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {888374/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Sell, Rent, Transfer, or Loan
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judiciary 46A
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {652811/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 55
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (89-47) 57
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Carter and Waldstreicher) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Carter and Waldstreicher) 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Refuses Recede 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Sydnor) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Sydnor) 62
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {893920/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {893920/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-37) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM