Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany County to issue a special beer festival license for specified purposes; authorizing the holder of the license to display and sell beer for consumption on or off the licensed premises on specified days and hours subject to specified limitations; requiring the holder to hold a specified other license; authorizing the Board to approve 4 weekends each year for the festival; authorizing the Board to approve specified premises for the festival; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0525
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 37
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 41
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM