Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Codifying the establishment of the Office of Security Management within the Department of Information Technology, the position of State Chief Information Security Officer, and the Maryland Cybersecurity Coordinating Council; altering the membership of the Council; requiring each unit of the Legislative or Judicial Branch of State government that uses a certain network to certify certain compliance to the Department on or before December 1 each year; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1183 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434037/1
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {434037/1
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {434037/1 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Committee Amendment {434037/1 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-107,   3.5-101, 3.5-2A-01 through 3.5-2A-05, 3.5-301, 3.5-302, 3.5-303, 3.5-307, 3.5-309, 3.5-311, 3.5-404, 3A-101 through 3A-702   )
Last Updated: 2/3/2021 11:37 AM
Click to return on the top page