Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Beidle, Hayes, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "Tier 1 renewable source" for purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard by adding certain hydroelectric power as a Tier 1 renewable source; applying the Act to all renewable portfolio standard compliance years that begin on or after January 1, 2020
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0601
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Eligibility
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page