Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Providing that certain limitations on the duration of certain tax exemptions for certain manufacturing property in Somerset County do not apply to an exemption granted to Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0133 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {269536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {165565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {269536/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Text - Third - Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Referred Ways and Means 27
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {165565/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Text - Chapter - Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:47 PM