Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law declaring that the existence of multiflora rose may be a certain nuisance on land used for agricultural production; repealing provisions of law requiring a person who owns land where multiflora rose is grown to maintain the land in a certain manner; repealing provisions of law requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to make a certain investigation under certain circumstances; repealing provisions of law requiring the Secretary to provide certain notice of a certain violation; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:25 PM