Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - New Interconnection Agreement
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person who is negotiating a specified solar installation and interconnection contract with specified customer-generator to submit to the customer-generator's electric company a specified application; allowing a specified person to accept a payment from the customer-generator in connection with the contract before receiving an approval from the customer-generator's electric company; prohibiting a specified person to begin a specified installation under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {597479/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 33
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM