Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition against operating golf carts on certain highways in the City of Crisfield in Somerset County; repealing the authority of the State Highway Administration to designate a location for golf carts to cross certain highways in the City Crisfield; and lowering the maximum speed limit from 35 to 30 miles per hour for a highway on which a person may operate a golf cart in the City of Crisfield.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Operation of Golf Carts on State Highways - City of Crisfield
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed 26
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Operation of Golf Carts on State Highways - City of Crisfield
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 30
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {690612/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM