Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini and Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Public Service Commission, when determining specified expenses while setting a just and reasonable rate for a gas company, to include all costs reasonably incurred by the gas company for performing environmental remediation of real property in response to a State or federal law, regulation, or order under specified conditions; authorizing that specified environmental remediation costs be included in a gas company's specified expenses regardless of specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0414
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted (33-13)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-12)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {153929/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected (49-88)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-55)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Adopted (33-13) 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-12) 48
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {153929/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected (49-88) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (83-55) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text - Chapter - Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM