Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ex-Offender Business Development Program Study
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Ramirez, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development, the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, and the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services jointly to study and evaluate the feasibility of establishing a business development program for ex-offenders and to identify nongovernmental funding sources for specified purposes; and requiring the Departments jointly to report their findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0698
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0535 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {862617/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-16)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 21
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Second Reading Passed 21
Senate 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 23
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Judiciary 26
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {862617/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-16) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM