Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Edwards, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a certain provision of law may not be construed to authorize the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility or while an offender is in a home detention program; authorizing the imposition of certain penalties for the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility and while an offender is in a home detention program; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0813
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0086 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:01 PM