Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Disadvantaged Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Filing Fee Exemption and Study
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Edwards, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to waive certain document filing fees for certain entities certified under the federal Disadvantaged Business Enterprise Program and certain veteran-owned small business enterprises; and requiring the Department to study and make recommendations regarding certain filing fees on or before January 1, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0204
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Disadvantaged Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Filing Fee Exemption and Study
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/6/2020 9:04 AM