Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Vehicle Attendant
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Montgomery, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from serving as a school vehicle attendant unless the attendant is a specified employee or a specified individual assigned or authorized to work with a specified student under specified circumstances, or has specified authorization, and possesses specified identification.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0530
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0312 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {240911/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Afzali) Withdrawn
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-3)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 43
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {240911/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Afzali) Withdrawn 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-3) 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-816 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM