Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Patterson, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Smith, Washington, West, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain State agencies to make available on their websites open meeting agendas 48 hours in advance of each meeting; requiring certain State agencies to post on their websites meeting minutes not more than 2 business days after the minutes are approved; requiring certain state agencies to maintain on their websites meeting minutes for 5 years and recordings for 1 year after the meeting; requiring the Department of Information Technology to provide certain staff, support, and equipment to the Maryland Transportation Authority; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0421
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794039/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876086/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {794039/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {876086/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (134-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Text - Chapter - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
(   10-604, 10-607 )
(   2-101, 2-102 )
(   2-101, 2-108 )
(   4-201, 4-211 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page