Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsored by
Senators West, Eckardt, Salling, Serafini, Waldstreicher, and Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Executive Director of the Maryland Aviation Administration to place donation boxes at the entrance to each security screening checkpoint at the Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; and requiring that money deposited in the donation boxes be appropriated to the Department of Disabilities to be used only to support transitional housing programs for individuals with disabilities.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0320 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {419231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {419231/1 Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 40
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-413.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM