Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Sponsored by
Senators West and Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Recognizing that manufacturers will need to partner with industry leaders, education stakeholders and others to explore new solutions to a global digital technology transformation the Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy is established to study and make recommendations on the State's entry into Industry 4.0 technology ; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 10:40 AM