Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Garrett County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $15,000,000 in order to assist in the financing of the cost of hospital improvements at Garrett County Memorial Hospital; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Appropriations 35
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM