Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local department of social services with a military installation in its jurisdiction to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the Military Family Advocacy Program for that installation; and establishing certain requirements for a memorandum of understanding under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0646
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-705.5 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page