Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to $20,000 the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income for individuals who are at least 55 years old; increasing to $10,000 the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0488 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {509439/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {509439/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Ways and Means 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page