Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Kasemeyer, DeGrange, King, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, beginning with the revenue estimate for fiscal year 2020, to calculate a specified share of General Fund revenues represented by specified nonwithholding income tax revenues; stating it is the goal of the State that 10% of estimated General Fund revenues in specified years be retained in the Revenue Stabilization Account; establishing the Fiscal Responsibility Fund for the purpose of retaining specified tax revenues to provide pay-as-you-go capital funds for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0503
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {419234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {419234/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text - Chapter - State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-104 through 6-106, 7-311, 7-329, 7-330 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM